Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luís Coutinho

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1415²Born
9 Sep 143923.7AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
1 Apr 144428.3AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
15 Nov 145236.9AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1453¹37.0DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luís Coutinho
Archbishop Luís Coutinho (born Dec 1415, died 1453) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 259, and Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 269
  • bd: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast