Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edmund Courcey, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ross, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jun 1484AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
26 Sep 1494AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
4 Nov 1517ResignedBishop of Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Edmund Courcey
Bishop John Edmund Courcey O.F.M. , Bishop Emeritus of Ross

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 131, and Page 225
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Dec 2018

Quantcast