Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Cotignola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ischia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1623³Born
24 Mar 169268.4AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
11 Dec 169875.2ResignedBishop of Ischia, Italy
22 Mar 170278.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ischia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Cotignola
Bishop Michelangelo Cotignola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018