Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marie Bertrand (Jean-Charles) Cothonay, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1854Born
15 Aug 187520.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 May 188025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Dec 191359.0AppointedPrefect of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
192469.0ResignedPrefect of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
25 May 192671.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Marie Bertrand (Jean-Charles) Cothonay (VIAF: 88764376)
Father Marie Bertrand (Jean-Charles) Cothonay O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Lang Són et Cao Bang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt Avit (Drôme)
Ordained PriestCarpentras
Death PlaceLang Són, Prefecture Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang

  • a priest for 46.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018