Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Costello

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1744²Born
30 Nov 176723.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
Dec 1767³23.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 178642.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland
30 Jun 178642.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
6 Jul 178642.5SucceededBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
9 Oct 183187.7DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Costello
Bishop Thomas Costello (born 1744, died ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallaghaderreen, Diocese of Achonry

  • a priest for 63.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 68, and Page 170
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 38
  • bp/bd/od/op/d: CB, 10 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Mar 2019

Quantcast