Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Francesco Costa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Savona


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jul 1587AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
12 Jun 1606AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
1624¹ResignedBishop of Savona, Italy
23 Mar 1624ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Francesco Costa
Bishop Pietro Francesco Costa , Bishop Emeritus of Savona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 292
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 305
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016