Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Costaguti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612Born
13 Jul 164331.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164331.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
23 Sep 165240.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
21 Jul 165341.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
6 Mar 165644.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
19 Jul 166048.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
6 Dec 166048.9DiedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Costaguti
Vincenzo Cardinal Costaguti (born 1612, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018