Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Cossu, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1725BornCuglieri
13 Oct 174823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
19 Dec 178560.5AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
24 Feb 178660.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
16 Aug 179671.1DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Cossu:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Cossu O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1790
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,825
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,053

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015