Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marcello Cortenovis, B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1731Born
1750²18.8ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
14 Feb 179765.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
14 Feb 179765.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
25 Oct 179867.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcello Cortenovis
Father Marcello Cortenovis B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 371, and Page 455
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016