Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Corrêa de Souza

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1585AppointedBishop of Ceuta and Tanger, Spain
16 Feb 1598AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
19 Oct 1614DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Diego Corrêa de Souza
Bishop Diego Corrêa de Souza (died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,585, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast