Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neal (Nelano) Conway

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1670²Born
Oct 1697²27.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 172656.6SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
7 Apr 172757.2ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
6 Jan 173868.0DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Neal (Nelano) Conway
Bishop Neal (Nelano) Conway (born 1670, died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallinascreen, Co. Derry
Buried Place (Original)Moneyconey

  • a priest for 40.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 65
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Aug 2020

Quantcast