Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Paolo Cardinal de Conti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1689Born
24 Sep 175970.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175970.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
21 Mar 176374.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
14 Dec 177081.8DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo de Conti
Pietro Paolo Cardinal de Conti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018