Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Lodovico Contarini

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1508AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
15 Aug 1508Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
16 Nov 1508DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Contarini:
Patriarch Lodovico Contarini (died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for .3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013