Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Contarini

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1409AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
18 Apr 1418AppointedAdministrator of Asolo (Cittanova; Eraclea), Italy
17 Jul 1422AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
14 Jul 1424AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
27 May 1426AppointedAdministrator of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
5 Nov 1426ResignedAdministrator of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
1427¹ResignedAdministrator of Asolo (Cittanova; Eraclea), Italy
1451¹DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Contarini
Patriarch Giovanni Contarini (died 1451) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 206, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 83, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast