Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Condulmer

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1635BornRecanati
8 Jun 167539.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 167539.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 168549.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
Oct 1688³52.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Condulmer:
Archbishop Filippo Condulmer (born , died Oct 1688) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a priest for 13.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 282
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015