Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittore Felice Conci

Deceased

Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1677Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 1703AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
18 Feb 1703Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
Jul 1715³DiedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittore Felice Conci:
Bishop Vittore Felice Conci (died Jul 1715) Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015