Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prospero Cardinal Colonna

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1410¹Born
24 May 142616.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
8 Nov 143020.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
8 Nov 143020.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 146353.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Prospero Colonna
Prospero Cardinal Colonna (born 1410, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 36.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast