Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Colonna

Deceased

Administrator of Rieti, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1456Born
15 May 148024.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jun 148024.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
10 Nov 148024.8AppointedAdministrator of Rieti, Italy
Nov 150347.8AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
26 Sep 150852.7DiedAdministrator of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Colonna
Giovanni Cardinal Colonna (born 1456, died ) Administrator of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 28.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 May 1480
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast