Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Eusebio Colombres

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Salta, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1778Born
23 Dec 185880.0AppointedBishop of Salta, Argentina
11 Feb 185980.1DiedBishop-Elect of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Eusebio Colombres
Father José Eusebio Colombres (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Salta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Miguel de Tucumán

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 494
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018