Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Fabio Colonna

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
24 Sep 152924.7AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
1 Apr 153934.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
19 Mar 155045.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
1554²49.0DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio Colonna
Patriarch Fabio Colonna (born 1505, died 1554) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177
  • ob: AT, 19 Dec 2016
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017