Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leandro Cardinal Colloredo, C.O. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Priest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1639Born
3 Jan 165717.7ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
166323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
2 Sep 168647.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168647.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
28 Feb 168848.8AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
7 Nov 168950.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
27 Apr 170566.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
11 Jan 170969.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

MicroData Summary for Leandro Colloredo (VIAF: 89112389)
Leandro Cardinal Colloredo C.O. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle, Colloredo di Montalbano
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017