Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Collicola

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1682Born
9 Dec 172644.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Apr 172845.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 172845.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
20 Oct 173048.3DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

MicroData Summary for Carlo Collicola
Carlo Cardinal Collicola (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018