Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Matthieu Cardinal Cointerel

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519BornMérannes, France
12 Dec 158364.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 158465.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
29 Nov 158566.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

MicroData Summary for Matthieu Cointerel:
Cardinal Matthieu Cointerel (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

  • a cardinal for 2.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013