Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prospero Cardinal Colonna di Sciarra

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1707Born
9 Sep 174336.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174336.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
12 Apr 174538.2Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
16 Feb 175649.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
24 Jan 176356.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
20 Apr 176558.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Prospero Colonna di Sciarra
Prospero Cardinal Colonna di Sciarra (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017