Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Colonna di Sciarra

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1708BornRome, Italy
174334.6AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
9 Sep 174335.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 174335.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
25 Sep 174638.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Mar 175344.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso
20 Sep 175648.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
20 Sep 175648.4AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
22 Sep 176052.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
18 Jan 176354.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Colonna di Sciarra:
Cardinal Girolamo Colonna di Sciarra (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a cardinal for 19.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013