Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Colonna Barberini di Sciarra

Deceased

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1788BornRome, Italy
2 Oct 182637.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 182840.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 182940.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
2 Jun 183243.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
28 Apr 184455.5AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
16 Jun 185667.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
10 Apr 186374.5DiedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Colonna Barberini di Sciarra:
Cardinal Benedetto Colonna Barberini di Sciarra (born , died ) Archpriest of Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

  • a cardinal for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013