Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Cobelluzzi

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564Born
19 Sep 161652.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 161652.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
17 Feb 161854.1AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
29 Jun 162662.4DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Scipione Cobelluzzi (VIAF: 70032202)
Scipione Cardinal Cobelluzzi (born 1564, died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViterbo, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1616

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017