Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Corrado de Cloaco

Deceased

Bishop of Noli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1387AppointedBishop of Sulcis, Italy
1389¹ResignedBishop of Sulcis, Italy
23 Aug 1390AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
5 Jan 1392AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
13 Sep 1396AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Noli, Italy
1405¹DiedBishop of Noli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Corrado de Cloaco
Archbishop Corrado de Cloaco (died 1405) Bishop of Noli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 469, and Page 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 102, and Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast