Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon de Clisson, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1264AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
29 Jun 1264Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
2 Feb 1285DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Simon de Clisson:
Bishop Simon de Clisson O.P. (died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 319
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,086

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014