Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Clèves, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1605AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
12 Mar 1606Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
22 Mar 1609DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

MicroData Summary for Louis de Clèves:
Bishop Louis de Clèves O.S.A. (died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015