Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernhard Cardinal von Cles (Clesio)

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Administrator of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1485Born
Jun 1514³29.2SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
25 Sep 151429.5ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
8 Sep 151530.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 151530.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
9 Mar 153044.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 153045.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
21 May 153954.1AppointedAdministrator of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
30 Jul 153954.3DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernhard von Cles (Clesio) (VIAF: 59192040)
Bernhard Cardinal von Cles (Clesio) (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCles, Diocese of Trento
Ordained BishopSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento
Death PlaceBrixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1530
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 318
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,288
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast