Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Clausse de Marchamont

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Apr 1608AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
28 Apr 1608AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
16 Aug 1615Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
1 Apr 1624SucceededBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
13 Dec 1640DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Clausse de Marchamont:
Bishop Henri Clausse de Marchamont (died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 141, and Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015