Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Cipolloni, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Torres, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1380¹AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
1384²AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
11 Feb 1390AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
24 May 1396AppointedBishop of Aegina Insula, Greece
4 Apr 1397AppointedArchbishop of Torres, Italy
1399¹DiedArchbishop of Torres, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cipolloni
Archbishop Antonio Cipolloni O.P. (died 1399) Archbishop of Torres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Diocese of Firenze

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 248, and Page 536
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 73, and Page 504
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 289
  • b: CB, 18 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Aug 2019

Quantcast