Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Cinci

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹Born
24 Dec 162340.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 162542.7AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
19 Sep 163855.7DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Cinci
Bishop Lodovico Cinci (born 1583, died ) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma

  • a priest for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017