Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Scipione Cicinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1470AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
1 Apr 1470Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
22 Mar 1474AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tricarico, Italy
1494DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Scipione Cicinelli
Archbishop Scipione Cicinelli (died 1494) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 255, and Page 244
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,508
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1470, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018