Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amerigo Cialente

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila, Italy

Titular Bishop of Daulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1833Born
20 Dec 185623.0Ordained PriestPriest of L’Aquila, Italy
18 Mar 189561.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila, Italy
18 Mar 189561.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
22 Feb 190773.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Amerigo Cialente
Bishop Amerigo Cialente (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucoli, Archdiocese of L’Aquila
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 240
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018