Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imre Christovich (Kristovich)

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1711Born
1737¹25.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 177765.9SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
28 Jul 177766.2ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
14 Sep 177766.3Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
23 Dec 179887.6DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Imre Christovich (Kristovich)
Bishop Imre Christovich (Kristovich) (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

EventPlace
Birth PlacePest
Death PlaceMakó

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast