Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonello Chiericato

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1443¹Born
8 Jan 147229.0AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
19 Jan 148441.0AppointedBishop of Trogir (Trał), Croatia
22 Oct 148845.8AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
19 Aug 150663.6DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonello Chiericato (VIAF: 63725760)
Bishop Leonello Chiericato (born 1443, died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 92, and Page 253
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018