Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Chiapponi

Deceased

Bishop of Rethymo, Greece

Bishop of Ario


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1564AppointedBishop of Ario, Greece
24 Apr 1564AppointedBishop of Rethymo, Greece
30 Nov 1581DiedBishop of Rethymo, Greece

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Chiapponi
Bishop Bartolomeo Chiapponi (died ) Bishop of Rethymo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 146, and Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,564, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast