Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Fadi Abou Chebel, O.M.M.

Apostolic Exarch of Colombia (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1969 BornDeir el Kamar
19 Jan 199424.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
23 Dec 199526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
20 Jan 201646.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Colombia (Maronite)

MicroData Summary for Fadi Abou Chebel:
Father Fadi Abou Chebel O.M.M. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Colombia

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Exarchate of Colombia (Maronite).

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 21 Jan 2016