Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Châtelet

Deceased

Bishop of Toul


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1565AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Toul, France
30 Jul 1565SucceededBishop of Toul, France
25 Jan 1580DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Châtelet:
Bishop Pierre de Châtelet (died ) Bishop of Toul

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013