Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Louis-Nicolas Charléty, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1673³Born
24 Sep 171946.7SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
30 May 172148.4ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
9 Dec 173663.9DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Nicolas Charléty
Abbot Louis-Nicolas Charléty C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Maurice

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2,015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jun 2020

Quantcast