Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Marie Zhang (Chang)

Deceased

Prefect of Puchi [Puqi], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1881Born
19 Dec 190827.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 192948.0AppointedPrefect of Puchi [Puqi], China
20 Apr 194160.0DiedPrefect of Puchi [Puqi], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie Zhang (Chang)
Father Joseph Marie Zhang (Chang) (born , died ) Prefect of Puchi [Puqi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHankow

  • a priest for 32.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast