Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Guillaume de Chanac

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1249¹Born
13 Aug 133283.6AppointedBishop of Paris, France
18 Apr 133384.2Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
26 Nov 134293.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
3 Jun 134899.4DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Chanac
Patriarch Guillaume de Chanac (born 1249, died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChanac

  • a bishop for 15.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391, and Page 82
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast