Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Foulgues de Chanac

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Nov 1342AppointedBishop of Paris, France
16 Feb 1343Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
25 Jul 1349DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Foulgues de Chanac
Bishop Foulgues de Chanac (died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Ordained BishopN.D. des Champs, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 May 2019

Quantcast