Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Chacón Velasco y Fajardo

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Nov 1632SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
31 Jan 1633ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Dec 1633²Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
27 May 1642DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Chacón Velasco y Fajardo:
Bishop Gonzalo Chacón Velasco y Fajardo (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,842
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 158, Number 999

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015