Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Francesco Ceva

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1625Born
3 Apr 164923.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 168357.6AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
Aug 1700³74.7DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Ceva
Bishop Carlo Francesco Ceva (born , died Aug 1700) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a priest for 51.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018