Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bernardo de Cespedes

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1693³BornAlghero
26 Jul 171622.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 174148.2SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
28 Feb 174248.5ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
25 Jan 174652.4DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bernardo de Cespedes:
Bishop Francesco Bernardo de Cespedes (born , died ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a priest for 29.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 127
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015