Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Cesi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Todi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1534AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
11 Mar 1545AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
15 Feb 1566ResignedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Cesi
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Cesi , Bishop Emeritus of Todi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163, and Page 321
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,534, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast