Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Cerqueira, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Funay (Funai), Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552²Born
1575²23.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
1589²37.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
29 Jan 159341.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Funay (Funai), Japan
29 Jan 159341.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
Nov 1593³41.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
18 Feb 159846.1SucceededBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan
15 Feb 161462.1DiedBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luís Cerqueira (VIAF: 54537784)
Bishop Luís Cerqueira S.J. (born 1552, died ) Bishop of Funay (Funai)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila de Alvito, Archdiocese of Évora, Portugal
Ordained BishopÉvora, Archdiocese of Évora, Portugal
Death PlaceNagasaki

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 191, and Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast